Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/05/2020 at 08:42:58 (UTC).

NEAL, LINDA G vs. THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA L L C

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 NEAL, LINDA G filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA L L C. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5430

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEAL, LINDA G

JONES, GERALDINE

Defendants

BACK TO GENESIS CHIROPRACTIC

Marietta, GA 30008

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA L L C

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Others

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (AN INSURANCE AGENCY) MAY BE SERVED WITH

15700 Long Vista Dr

Austin, TX 78728

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA L L C (AN INSURANCE AGENCY)

211 East 7Th Street Suite 260

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKETT, PAIGE JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

11/03/2020: Affidavit of Service

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

10/12/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

10/12/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

10/12/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT 2

10/12/2020: EXHIBIT 2

EXHIBIT 1

10/12/2020: EXHIBIT 1

DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

10/12/2020: DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BACK TO GENESIS CHIROPRACTIC; Issued: 10/14/2020; Tracking: 73800644; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BACK TO GENESIS CHIROPRACTIC; Tracking: 73800632; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE (AN INSURANCE AGENCY) MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 10/14/2020; Served: 11/3/2020; Tracking: 73800593; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA L L C (AN INSURANCE AGENCY); Issued: 10/14/2020; Tracking: 73800588; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LOCKETT, PAIGE JUSTIN; Person Filing: JONES, GERALDINE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LOCKETT, PAIGE JUSTIN; Person Filing: NEAL, LINDA G;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant