This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:04:52 (UTC).

NAVA, JOSE ISABEL vs. NAVA, MARIA DEL CARMEN

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 NAVA, JOSE ISABEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NAVA, MARIA DEL CARMEN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0364

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

NAVA, JOSE ISABEL

NAVA, MARIA DEL CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADJEI, JUSTICE BOTCHWAY

Defendant Attorney

MALDONADO, AIMEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2011
  • FOCAS PROJECT - OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • ORD SGND GRNTNG CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (TRCP 162) (FAMILY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • MOTION CONTEMPT : Filing Attorney - DOMESTIC RELATIONS OFC,IV-D MONITORING PROGRAM Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY DOMESTIC RELATIONS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • FOCAS PROJECT - IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOPEZ, DAVID ANTHONY Person Filing - NAVA, MARIA DEL CARMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADJEI, JUSTICE BOTCHWAY Person Filing - NAVA, JOSE ISABEL

    Read MoreRead Less