This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:31:37 (UTC).

MUSHOVIC, LORI LEE vs. MUSHOVIC, TODD JAMES SR

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 MUSHOVIC, LORI LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MUSHOVIC, TODD JAMES SR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6360

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUSHOVIC, LORI LEE

Defendant

MUSHOVIC, TODD JAMES SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDLIN, DANITA L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RELEASING WAGE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2004
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HANDLIN, DANITA L. Person Filing - MUSHOVIC, LORI LEE

    Read MoreRead Less