This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:16:37 (UTC).

MOSTAGHIMI, ALI vs. MEDINA, ED (DBA AZTEC MASONRY AND CONCRETE)

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 MOSTAGHIMI, ALI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEDINA, ED DBA AZTEC MASONRY AND CONCRETE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1329

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSTAGHIMI, ALI

Defendants

MEDINA, ED (DBA AZTEC MASONRY AND CONCRETE)

Houston, TX 77029

AZTEC MASONRY & CONCRETE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service.

06/08/2020: Affidavit of Service.

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition

05/26/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MEDINA, ED (DBA AZTEC MASONRY AND CONCRETE); Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/30/2020; Tracking: 73753094; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN; Person Filing: MOSTAGHIMI, ALI;

    Read MoreRead Less