This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 07:18:29 (UTC).

MORTON, JUSTIN EARL vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 MORTON, JUSTIN EARL filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8604

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTON, JUSTIN EARL

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

CITY OF HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION - HOUSTON OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEYON, DEREK HOLLIS

Defendant Attorney

RISNER, BOBBIE K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Requesting Party: DEYON, DEREK HOLLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RISNER, BOBBIE K.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74021166; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74021165; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74021164; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE; Issued: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74021163; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74021162; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74021161; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74021157; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/29/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DEYON, DEREK HOLLIS; Person Filing: MORTON, JUSTIN EARL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant