This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 18:12:55 (UTC).

MORRIS, JIMMIE D vs. AMF INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 12/22/2004 MORRIS, JIMMIE D filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AMF INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2958

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MORRIS, JIMMIE D

MORRIS, BILLY J

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

AMF INCORPORATED

A W CHESTERTON

ABLE SUPPLY CO

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC

BENJAMIN F SHAW CO

BLOUNT INC (FDBA BLOUNT BROTHERS CORPORATION)

BLOUNT BROTHERS CORPORATION

CHEVRON USA INC (FDBA GULF OIL)

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HENDERSON, PAUL DUNFORD

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

PEVSNER, JOSEPH STUART

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

POWELL, LISA A.

POWERS, JAMES H.

CALDERON, RAUL M.

WHITE, CLAY M.

TAYLOR, THOMAS W

WILLIAM, MOYE R.

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

Other Attorneys

CLARK, SANDRA FRENCH

SHANNON, CHRISTINE SIMONEAUX

ADAMS, KENT M.

RILEY, JAMES M. JR.

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

WENDELL, SHARON KAY JACKSON

14 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2012
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2005
  • ANSWER CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - VIACOM INC (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAM, MOYE R. Person Filing - BLOUNT BROTHERS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - HERCULES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - AMETEK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENDERSON, PAUL DUNFORD Person Filing - MORRIS, BILLY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENDERSON, PAUL DUNFORD Person Filing - MORRIS, JIMMIE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2002
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WENDELL, SHARON KAY JACKSON Person Filing - GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less