This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 08:18:55 (UTC).

MORENO, BERNARDO ARTURO vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 MORENO, BERNARDO ARTURO filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9978

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO, BERNARDO ARTURO

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TN 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUIZ, JOSEPH MANUEL

733 E. 12 1/2

Houston, TX 77008

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766780; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766778; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766777; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766775; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766774; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/15/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RUIZ, JOSEPH MANUEL; Person Filing: MORENO, BERNARDO ARTURO;

    Read MoreRead Less