Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/02/2021 at 07:28:33 (UTC).

MORAN, ELIZABETH vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 MORAN, ELIZABETH filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are FREDERICKA PHILLIPS and RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0757

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORAN, ELIZABETH

Houston, TX 77011

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingCourt: 127; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING; Issued: 4/22/2021; Tracking: 73862305; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 4/22/2021; Tracking: 73862304; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 4/22/2021; Tracking: 73862303; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 4/22/2021; Tracking: 73862301; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 4/22/2021; Tracking: 73862299; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 4/22/2021; Tracking: 73862296; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 4/22/2021; Tracking: 73862295; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 4/20/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/13/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: MORAN, ELIZABETH;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant