Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:16:55 (UTC).

MONTOYA, MARIA DE JESUS PALOMARES vs. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 MONTOYA, MARIA DE JESUS PALOMARES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3375

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTOYA, MARIA DE JESUS PALOMARES

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

ALLSTATE FIRE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMOS, HERIBERTO RICARDO

Defendant Attorney

GUEST, KIMBERLY ANN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Notice of Serving Affidavits

03/24/2021: Plaintiff's Notice of Serving Affidavits

Original Answer of Defendant Allstate Firse and Casualty Insurance Company, Demand for Jury Trial, and Reques for Disclosure

03/24/2021: Original Answer of Defendant Allstate Firse and Casualty Insurance Company, Demand for Jury Trial, and Reques for Disclosure

Request for Issuance OF Service

03/09/2021: Request for Issuance OF Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

03/09/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

Return of Service

03/12/2021: Return of Service

Return of Service

03/12/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GUEST, KIMBERLY ANN; Person Filing: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLSTATE FIRE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 3/9/2021; Tracking: 73847823; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMOS, HERIBERTO RICARDO; Person Filing: MONTOYA, MARIA DE JESUS PALOMARES;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly A. Guest