This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:34:42 (UTC).

MONTOYA, ALICIA DEL CARMEN vs. MONTOYA, ARNOLD D

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 MONTOYA, ALICIA DEL CARMEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MONTOYA, ARNOLD D. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6381

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTOYA, ALICIA DEL CARMEN

Defendant

MONTOYA, ARNOLD D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIVERS, JESSE E. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2004
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • WAIVER APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHIVERS, JESSE E. JR. Person Filing - MONTOYA, ALICIA DEL CARMEN

    Read MoreRead Less