Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:51:28 (UTC).

ATHARI, MOHAMMAD (M D) (P A) vs. CORTICARE INC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 ATHARI, MOHAMMAD M D P A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CORTICARE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9603

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

UNITED NEUROLOGY, P.A.

MOHAMMAD ATHARI, M.D., P.A.

ATHARI, MOHAMMAD (M D) (P A)

MOHAMMAD ATHARI (M D) (P A)

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CORTICARE, INC.

CORTICARE INC

Other

CORTICARE INC (CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

5950 Laplace Court Suite 160

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

TREDENNICK, EDWARD COE

 

Court Documents

Exhibit B to Original Petition and Counterclaim

04/24/2020: Exhibit B to Original Petition and Counterclaim

Exhibit A to Original Petition and Counterclaim

04/24/2020: Exhibit A to Original Petition and Counterclaim

Original Answer and Counterclaim

04/24/2020: Original Answer and Counterclaim

Counter-Defendants' Original Answer to Counter-Plaintiff's Original Counterclaim

05/18/2020: Counter-Defendants' Original Answer to Counter-Plaintiff's Original Counterclaim

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: TREDENNICK, EDWARD COE; Person Filing: UNITED NEUROLOGY, P.A.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: TREDENNICK, EDWARD COE; Person Filing: MOHAMMAD ATHARI (M D) (P A);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: GERNERT, CAITLIN ELIZABETH; Person Filing: CORTICARE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: GERNERT, CAITLIN ELIZABETH; Person Filing: CORTICARE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CORTICARE INC (CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE; Issued: 4/1/2020; Tracking: 73739771; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TREDENNICK, EDWARD COE; Person Filing: ATHARI, MOHAMMAD (M D) (P A);

    Read MoreRead Less