This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:15:36 (UTC).

MM FUNDING vs. JPMORGAN CHASE N A

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 MM FUNDING filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE N A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******880A

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MM FUNDING

Defendant

JPMORGAN CHASE N A

Other

JPMORGAN CHASE N A MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REGENT, ANH HUYNH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Garnishment

06/04/2020: Notice of Garnishment

Return of Service

06/15/2020: Return of Service

Letter to Clerk

05/26/2020: Letter to Clerk

Application for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

05/26/2020: Application for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: GARNISHMENT APPLICATION; Person: JPMORGAN CHASE N A MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 5/28/2020; Served: 6/3/2020; Received: 6/15/2020; Tracking: 73753629; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: GARNISHMENT APPLICATION; Filing Attorney: REGENT, ANH HUYNH; Person Filing: MM FUNDING;

    Read MoreRead Less