This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:10:20 (UTC).

MITCHELL, CHARLESTON vs. PACE, WILBURN

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 MITCHELL, CHARLESTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PACE, WILBURN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7566

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MITCHELL, CHARLESTON

MITCHELL, RHONDA (IND & ANF CADE MITCHELL) (MINOR)

MITCHELL, CADE (MINOR)

Defendant

PACE, WILBURN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RANDLE, SARNIE A. JR.

Defendant Attorney

SIMMONS, RICHARD ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2006
  • MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2006
  • REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RANDLE, SARNIE A. JR. Person Filing - MITCHELL, CADE (MINOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RANDLE, SARNIE A. JR. Person Filing - MITCHELL, CHARLESTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RANDLE, SARNIE A. JR. Person Filing - MITCHELL, RHONDA (IND & ANF CADE MITCHELL) (MINOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIMMONS, RICHARD ALLEN Person Filing - PACE, WILBURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RANDLE, SARNIE A. JR. Person Filing - MITCHELL, CHARLESTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RANDLE, SARNIE A. JR. Person Filing - MITCHELL, CADE (MINOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RANDLE, SARNIE A. JR. Person Filing - MITCHELL, RHONDA (IND & ANF CADE MITCHELL) (MINOR)

    Read MoreRead Less