This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/23/2021 at 07:35:14 (UTC).

MIRANDA, AVERY vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 MIRANDA, AVERY filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9002

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRANDA, AVERY

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - CJAD

209 W 14Th St,

Austin, TX 78701

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KEVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION (OCA EXPUNCTIONS) BY SERVING

205 W 14Th Street Ste 600

Austin, TX 78701

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Houston, TX 78765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2021
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - CJAD; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73888156; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886783; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION (OCA EXPUNCTIONS) BY SERVING; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886780; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886777; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886776; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KEVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886774; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886771; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886760; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/8/2021; Tracking: 73886753; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/1/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: MIRANDA, AVERY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Parole Division is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant