This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:36:57 (UTC).

MIRAMAR LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. PEOPLES, BRENDAN

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 MIRAMAR LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PEOPLES, BRENDAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1698

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRAMAR LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

PEOPLES, BRENDAN

Tomball, TX 77375

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLAIN, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

06/05/2020: Affidavit of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit A

05/26/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PEOPLES, BRENDAN; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73752829; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCLAIN, MELISSA; Person Filing: MIRAMAR LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less