Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/13/2015 at 02:26:53 (UTC).

MILLER, NILES E vs. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/21/2005 MILLER, NILES E filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2300

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MILLER, NILES E

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GRORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AQUA CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION

BECHTEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

BECHTEL GROUP INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION (FKA HERCULES INC)

HERCULES INC

DANA CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY

OWENS ILLINOIS INC

RILEY POWER INC (FKA BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC FKA DB RILEY INC

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

TAPSCOTT, WILLIAM KEN JR.

FERRELL, MELISSA K.

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

WHITE, CLAY M.

STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN

POWERS, JAMES H.

MOIR, PETER A.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

Other Attorneys

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

REA, PAM

KINSEL, J. FRANK JR.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

BOOK, WILLIAM C. JR.

HENDRYX, MICHAEL

RANDLE, RAYMOND GLENN JR.

WARE, JAMES L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RANDLE, RAYMOND GLENN JR. Person Filing - RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION (FKA GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOOK, WILLIAM C. JR. Person Filing - MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOOK, WILLIAM C. JR. Person Filing - "3M"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - CBS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - VIACOM INC (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION F/K/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - BOOK, WILLIAM C. JR. Person Filing - MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GRORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FERRELL, MELISSA K. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - FERRELL, MELISSA K. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - FERRELL, MELISSA K. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TAPSCOTT, WILLIAM KEN JR. Person Filing - MILLER, NILES E

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OWENS-ILLINOIS INC (SUCCESSORTO OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY) is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL GROUP INC. is a litigant