This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:29:07 (UTC).

MILLER, LISA MERRITT vs. MILLER, GARY LYNN

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 MILLER, LISA MERRITT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MILLER, GARY LYNN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6336

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER, LISA MERRITT

Defendant

MILLER, GARY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHILLING, CHARLES D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHILLING, CHARLES D. Person Filing - MILLER, LISA MERRITT

    Read MoreRead Less