This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/12/2022 at 07:24:04 (UTC).

MILES, KIMBERLY RONA vs. OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 MILES, KIMBERLY RONA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8535

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILES, KIMBERLY RONA

Defendants

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE CJAD

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PCT. 4

HARRIS COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE PCT. 4 PLACE 2

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE CJAD; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74072973; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PCT. 4; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74072969; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE PCT. 4 PLACE 2; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74072966; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74067804; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74067801; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74067800; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74067798; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74067795; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74067794; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 11/3/2022; Tracking: 74067792; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 10/25/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: MILES, KIMBERLY RONA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less