This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/11/2021 at 07:40:15 (UTC).

METTENBRINK, ALEXANDER THOMAS vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 METTENBRINK, ALEXANDER THOMAS filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8325

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METTENBRINK, ALEXANDER THOMAS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

BELLAIRE POLICE DEPARTMENT

2929 Allen Parkway Ste 3150,

Houston, TX 77019

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY (DPS)

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (FBI)

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

201 Caroline 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

500 Jefferson Suite 600

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS

1201 Franklin 12Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMMELS, PHILP M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BELLAIRE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73934533; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73928871; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73928870; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73928869; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73928867; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73928866; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73928865; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 10/22/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOMMELS, PHILP M.; Person Filing: METTENBRINK, ALEXANDER THOMAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE is a litigant

Latest cases where BELLAIRE POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant