This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 07:21:42 (UTC).

MENDOZA, GABRIELA CALDERON vs. LE, TU LONG

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 MENDOZA, GABRIELA CALDERON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LE, TU LONG. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6728

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA, GABRIELA CALDERON

Defendants

LE, TU LONG

Houston, TX 77072

A/C ADVANCE

Other

A/C ADVANCE (A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH

10711 Umber Court

Houston, TX 77099

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALINDO, CRISTOBAL MIGUEL

Defendant Attorney

CAVANAGH, JONATHAN DOWNES

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

06/22/2022: Return of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

06/21/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

Request for Issuance of Service

06/21/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

06/21/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Defendants' Original Answer

07/12/2022: Defendants' Original Answer

Mendoza - Defendants' Jury Demand

07/12/2022: Mendoza - Defendants' Jury Demand

Mendoza - Defendants' 193.7 Objection

07/12/2022: Mendoza - Defendants' 193.7 Objection

Declaration of Jayme Chacon of Due Diligence

07/07/2022: Declaration of Jayme Chacon of Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: CAVANAGH, JONATHAN DOWNES; Person Filing: A/C ADVANCE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: CAVANAGH, JONATHAN DOWNES; Person Filing: LE, TU LONG;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: A/C ADVANCE (A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 6/21/2022; Tracking: 74018752; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LE, TU LONG; Issued: 6/21/2022; Tracking: 74018751; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GALINDO, CRISTOBAL MIGUEL; Person Filing: MENDOZA, GABRIELA CALDERON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less