This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/30/2021 at 07:18:28 (UTC).

MENDOZA, CRISTINA vs. SCOREMORE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 MENDOZA, CRISTINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SCOREMORE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9050

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA, CRISTINA

Defendants

SCOREMORE LLC

SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC

SCOREMORE MGMT LLC

AEG FACILITIES LLC

ONEX CORPORATION

SMG HOLDINGS LLC

ASM GLOBAL LLC

ASM GLOBAL PARENT INC

EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC

CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC

WEBSTER, JACQUES (II) (A/K/A TRAVIS SCOTT)

Cypress, TX 77429

HARRIS COUNTY SPORTS & CONVENTION CORPORATION

NRG ENERGY INC

SCOTT, TRAVIS

Others

SCOREMORE LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

5704 W Hwy 290

Austin, TX 78735

SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

SCOREMORE MGMT LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

5704 W Hwy 290

Austin, TX 78735

AEG FACILITIES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

2710 Gateway Oaks Drive Suite 150N

Sacramento, CA 95833

ONEX CORPORATION (A CANADIAN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff Cristina Mendoza's Notice of Nonsuit

12/09/2021: Plaintiff Cristina Mendoza's Notice of Nonsuit

Proposed order of partial nonsuit without prejudice.

12/09/2021: Proposed order of partial nonsuit without prejudice.

Plaintiff's original petition

12/06/2021: Plaintiff's original petition

Request for Issuance of Service

12/06/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Notice to the court of filing of motion to transfer under rule 13, rules of judicial administration

12/27/2021: Notice to the court of filing of motion to transfer under rule 13, rules of judicial administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NRG ENERGY INC (A FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948125; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SPORTS & CONVENTION CORPORATION (A FOR-PROFIT; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948124; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WEBSTER, JACQUES (II) (A/K/A TRAVIS SCOTT); Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948122; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948118; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948117; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASM GLOBAL PARENT INC (A FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948116; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASM GLOBAL LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948113; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SMG HOLDINGS LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948109; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ONEX CORPORATION (A CANADIAN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948105; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AEG FACILITIES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948103; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE MGMT LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948101; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948100; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/6/2021; Tracking: 73948099; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN; Person Filing: MENDOZA, CRISTINA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less