This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:26:01 (UTC).

MENDEZ, MARIA HERMELINDA vs. GOMEZ, JOSE LUIS

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 MENDEZ, MARIA HERMELINDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GOMEZ, JOSE LUIS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1006

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDEZ, MARIA HERMELINDA

Defendants

GOMEZ, JOSE LUIS

GARCIA, JOSE HUMBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUMAN, RICHARD A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2007
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2006
  • ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM : Filing Attorney - RAMIREZ, KARINA A Person Filing - GARCIA, JOSE HUMBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEE AWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2006
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM : Filing Attorney - LANDA, ANGELICA Person Filing - LANDA, ANGELICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHUMAN, RICHARD A. Person Filing - MENDEZ, MARIA HERMELINDA

    Read MoreRead Less