This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:19:03 (UTC).

MEMORIAL MRI & DIAGNOSTIC LLC vs. WILSON, FREDERICK KENDRICK (II)

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 MEMORIAL MRI DIAGNOSTIC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILSON, FREDERICK KENDRICK II. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1399

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEMORIAL MRI & DIAGNOSTIC LLC

Defendant

WILSON, FREDERICK KENDRICK (II)

Sugarland, TX 77479

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANTLEY, PHILLIP MORGAN

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order

06/17/2020: Proposed Order

Plaintiff's Nonsuit

06/17/2020: Plaintiff's Nonsuit

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

05/29/2020: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WILSON, FREDERICK KENDRICK (II); Issued: 5/26/2020; Served: 5/27/2020; Received: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73752611; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRANTLEY, PHILLIP MORGAN; Person Filing: MEMORIAL MRI & DIAGNOSTIC LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less