This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/23/2015 at 02:30:38 (UTC).

MELON, JOHN vs. AMERICAN STANDARD INC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2004 MELON, JOHN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AMERICAN STANDARD INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1082

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MELON, JOHN

MCENTIRE, WARREN

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC (SUCCESSOR MUNDET CORK COMPANY)

DAP INC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL INC SUCCESSOR

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

GENERAL MOTORS CORP

BIRD INCORPORATED

MCENTIRE, WILLIAM KEITH (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE

GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

MELON, DANNY (CHILD OF DECEASED)

NEVAREZ, JEANETTE (CHILD OF DECEASED)

WARREN PUMPS INC (CORPORATION)

MELON, DANNY

NEVAREZ, JEANETTE

GUADIAN, DOLORES (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT JOHN MELON)

GUADIAN, JOANN (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT JOHN MELON)

MELON, JOHNNY JR (SON OF DECEDENT JOHN MELON)

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AGCO CORPORATION

83 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

BERNER, HEATHER ANN

PEVSNER, JOSEPH STUART

RHODES, KENNETH D.

WRIGHT, DAWN MARIE

CLARY, BRIAN S.

MAYFIELD, JORDAN ALEXANDER

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

MCLEROY, JIMMY DEAN

Other Attorneys

WHITE, CLAY M.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

REYNARD, DAVID D. JR.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE

HARRIS, JAMES MAYER JR.

SPENCER, JOE AURELIANO JR.

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

17 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2007
  • TRANSFER CASE TO ANOTHER JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • COURT SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • ORDER GRANTING MTN IN LIMINE IN PART SIGNED SEE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • ORDER GRANTING MTN IN LIMINE IN PART SIGNED SEE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • ORDER GRANTING MTN IN LIMINE IN PART SIGNED SEE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD Person Filing - BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (DBA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2004
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC (INCORRECTLY SUED HEREINAS GUARDLINE INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - BIRD CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - BIRD INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - MCENTIRE, WILLIAM KEITH (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2004
  • PLEA OF PRIVILEDGE : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - MELON, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2004
  • PLEA OF PRIVILEDGE : Filing Attorney - KENNEDY, NICOLE BROWN Person Filing - MCENTIRE, WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2002
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less