Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:47:16 (UTC).

MEJIA, JULIO ONAN (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF MINOR CHILDREN vs. BEMBROSE, JOHN RAY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 MEJIA, JULIO ONAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF MINOR CHILDREN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BEMBROSE, JOHN RAY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9551

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MXXXX, DXXXX (MINOR)

MXXXX, JXXXX (MINOR)

MXXXX, AXXXXX (MINOR)

MEJIA, JULIO ONAN (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF MINOR CHILDREN

Defendant

BEMBROSE, JOHN RAY

Conroe, TX 77303

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILBE, JOSHUA RYAN

3120 Southwest

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

05/22/2020: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

Proposed Order

05/22/2020: Proposed Order

Exhibit A

05/22/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Motion For Substitute Service on Defendnt John Ray Bemborse

05/22/2020: Plaintiff's Motion For Substitute Service on Defendnt John Ray Bemborse

Affidavit of Service of John Ray Bembrose

06/03/2020: Affidavit of Service of John Ray Bembrose

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Civil Case information sheet

03/26/2020: Civil Case information sheet

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH JURY DEMAND AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH JURY DEMAND AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/22/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BEMBROSE, JOHN RAY; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73738615; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILBE, JOSHUA RYAN; Person Filing: MXXXX, JXXXX (MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILBE, JOSHUA RYAN; Person Filing: MXXXX, AXXXXX (MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILBE, JOSHUA RYAN; Person Filing: MXXXX, DXXXX (MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HILBE, JOSHUA RYAN; Person Filing: MEJIA, JULIO ONAN (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF MINOR CHILDREN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less