This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 07:19:11 (UTC).

MEDRANO, VALENTINA AGNES vs. THE KROGER CO (D/B/A KROGER TEXAS L P)

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 MEDRANO, VALENTINA AGNES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO D/B/A KROGER TEXAS L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3865

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDRANO, VALENTINA AGNES

Defendants

THE KROGER CO (D/B/A KROGER TEXAS L P)

KROGER TEXAS L P

Other

THE KROGER CO (D/B/A KROGER TEXAS L P) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGO, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

10/01/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Request for Issuance of Service

10/01/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Defendant's Original Answer

10/15/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Jury Demand

10/15/2021: Jury Demand

Return of Service

10/11/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: THE KROGER CO (D/B/A KROGER TEXAS L P);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE KROGER CO (D/B/A KROGER TEXAS L P) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 10/1/2021; Served: 10/11/2021; Tracking: 73923346; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NGO, CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: MEDRANO, VALENTINA AGNES;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.