This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/09/2019 at 07:36:30 (UTC).

MEDARD, NANCY KUHN vs. MEDARD, CLAUDE PHILIPPE

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 MEDARD, NANCY KUHN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MEDARD, CLAUDE PHILIPPE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1225

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDARD, NANCY KUHN

Defendants

MEDARD, CLAUDE PIERRE

MEDARD, CLAUDE PHILIPPE

MEDARD, LAURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLER, MATTHEW STEPHEN

1021 Main Stree

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

DI FERRANTE, CHRISTIAN P.

402 E. 11Th St

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

Subpoena

02/15/2019: Subpoena

Statement of Service

02/15/2019: Statement of Service

first amended original petition including appllication for temporary injunction and referencing application for temporary restraining order (already granted)

02/19/2019: first amended original petition including appllication for temporary injunction and referencing application for temporary restraining order (already granted)

Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

02/22/2019: Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction

02/25/2019: Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction

Notice of Submission

02/25/2019: Notice of Submission

Exhibit 01

02/25/2019: Exhibit 01

Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction

02/25/2019: Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction

Proposed Order

02/26/2019: Proposed Order

Motion to Enter Order

02/26/2019: Motion to Enter Order

Proposed Order Extending and Modifying Temporary Restraining Order and Reserring Temporary Injunction Hearing

02/26/2019: Proposed Order Extending and Modifying Temporary Restraining Order and Reserring Temporary Injunction Hearing

ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

02/27/2019: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Petition

02/28/2019: Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Petition

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

02/13/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Affidavit

02/13/2019: Affidavit

Plaintiff's Original Petition, Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

02/13/2019: Plaintiff's Original Petition, Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

Clerk's Certificate Of Cash Deposit In Lieu Of Injunction Bond Per Order Of The Court

02/14/2019: Clerk's Certificate Of Cash Deposit In Lieu Of Injunction Bond Per Order Of The Court

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

02/14/2019: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MULLER, MATTHEW STEPHEN; Person Filing: MEDARD, NANCY KUHN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 2/27/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Description: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/27/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DI FERRANTE, CHRISTIAN P.; Person Filing: MEDARD, CLAUDE PIERRE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DI FERRANTE, CHRISTIAN P.; Person Filing: MEDARD, CLAUDE PHILIPPE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MULLER, MATTHEW STEPHEN; Person Filing: MEDARD, NANCY KUHN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/14/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 2/14/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 2/14/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MULLER, MATTHEW STEPHEN; Person Filing: MEDARD, NANCY KUHN;

    Read MoreRead Less