Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 07:20:10 (UTC).

MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL vs. WESTSIDE SURGICAL HOSPITAL LLC (D/B/A WESTSIDE BRE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL filed an Other lawsuit against WESTSIDE SURGICAL HOSPITAL LLC D/B/A WESTSIDE BRE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5362

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL

Defendants

WESTSIDE SURGICAL HOSPITAL LLC (D/B/A WESTSIDE BREAST CENTER LLC)

WHITMEYER, MARY BUSH

KIGGUNDU, OMAR

WESTSIDE BREAST CENTER LLC

KIGGUNDU, LUKAMBUZI OMAR (A/K/A OMAR KIGGUNDU)

HOLLEY, MARY NAN

WHITMEYER, MARY NAN (A/K/A MARY BUSH WHITMEYER F/K/A MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUEST, KIMBERLY ANN

421 E Airport Fr

Irving, TX 75062

Defendant Attorneys

KEY, MATTHEW ALVIN

1401 Enclave Pa

Houston, TX 77077

ROTHBERG, TIMOTHY ABRAHAM

3050 Post Oak B

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition with Request for Disclosure and Request for Admissions

01/28/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition with Request for Disclosure and Request for Admissions

Whitmeyer, Mary Nan - Citation

01/28/2021: Whitmeyer, Mary Nan - Citation

Westside Surgical Hospital, LLC - Citation

01/28/2021: Westside Surgical Hospital, LLC - Citation

Letter Requesting Fees for Transfer of Venue

01/28/2021: Letter Requesting Fees for Transfer of Venue

Letter regarding Filing Original Petition

01/28/2021: Letter regarding Filing Original Petition

Letter - List of Documents

01/28/2021: Letter - List of Documents

Letter - 2nd Request for Transfer of Venue Fees

01/28/2021: Letter - 2nd Request for Transfer of Venue Fees

ESig Rule 306a Notice of Final Judgment and Appealable Order

01/28/2021: ESig Rule 306a Notice of Final Judgment and Appealable Order

Defendant's Original Answer

01/28/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Defendant Omar Kiggundu's Motion to Transfer Venue Plea in Abatement and Subject to Same Verified Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

01/28/2021: Defendant Omar Kiggundu's Motion to Transfer Venue Plea in Abatement and Subject to Same Verified Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

Defendant Mary Nan Whitmeyer;s Motion to Transfer Venue Plea in Abatement & Subject thereto Original Answer

01/28/2021: Defendant Mary Nan Whitmeyer;s Motion to Transfer Venue Plea in Abatement & Subject thereto Original Answer

Clerk's Certificate

01/28/2021: Clerk's Certificate

Citation/Affidavit of Service- Westside

01/28/2021: Citation/Affidavit of Service- Westside

Citation/Affidavit of Service- Mary

01/28/2021: Citation/Affidavit of Service- Mary

Citation Return- Lukaambuzi

01/28/2021: Citation Return- Lukaambuzi

Bill of Cost

01/28/2021: Bill of Cost

Signed Agreed Order to Transfer

01/28/2021: Signed Agreed Order to Transfer

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

02/10/2021: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/10/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KEY, MATTHEW ALVIN; Person Filing: HOLLEY, MARY NAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROTHBERG, TIMOTHY ABRAHAM; Person Filing: KIGGUNDU, LUKAMBUZI OMAR (A/K/A OMAR KIGGUNDU);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROTHBERG, TIMOTHY ABRAHAM; Person Filing: KIGGUNDU, OMAR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PLEA OF PRIVILEDGE; Filing Attorney: GUEST, KIMBERLY ANN; Person Filing: MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KEY, MATTHEW ALVIN; Person Filing: WHITMEYER, MARY BUSH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KEY, MATTHEW ALVIN; Person Filing: WHITMEYER, MARY NAN (A/K/A MARY BUSH WHITMEYER F/K/A MARY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westside Surgical Hospital, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly A. Guest