This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 07:40:41 (UTC).

MCCULLOCH, TIMOTHY vs. TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 MCCULLOCH, TIMOTHY filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3808

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCULLOCH, TIMOTHY

Defendants

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY PRE TRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

OCA EXPUNCTIONS, LEGAL DIVISION

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTION

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE

209 W. 14Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

Others

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

OCA EXPUNCTIONS LEGAL DIVISION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROYCE, THOMAS L. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Requesting Party: ROYCE, THOMAS L. JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74036190; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029338; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OCA EXPUNCTIONS LEGAL DIVISION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029337; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029336; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029335; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029334; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029333; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029332; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029331; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 8/9/2022; Tracking: 74029330; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/22/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROYCE, THOMAS L. JR.; Person Filing: MCCULLOCH, TIMOTHY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY - COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where OCA EXPUNCTIONS- LEGAL DIVISIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant