This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:21:19 (UTC).

MCCOY, CATENA vs. GARDEN', ALI

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 MCCOY, CATENA filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against GARDEN', ALI. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8559

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCOY, CATENA

Defendant

GARDEN', ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, WILLIAM E

Defendant Attorney

PRAPPAS, GEORGE J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2006
  • FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ACKNOWLEDGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF ON JURY VERDICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • STENO FEE ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • JURY VERDICT RENDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • JURY DELIBERATING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED JURY TRIAL (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2006
  • JURY PANEL EXAMINED ON VOIR DIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2006
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, GORDON E. Person Filing - GARDEN', ALI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JONES, WILLIAM E Person Filing - MCCOY, CATENA

    Read MoreRead Less