This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 07:15:48 (UTC).

MCCLENDON, DEXTER vs. BJS RESTAURANT (DBA CHICAGO PIZZA & BREWERY LP

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 MCCLENDON, DEXTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BJS RESTAURANT DBA CHICAGO PIZZA BREWERY LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1530

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCLENDON, DEXTER

Defendants

BJS RESTAURANT (DBA CHICAGO PIZZA & BREWERY LP

CHICAGO PIZZA & BREWERY LP

Other

BJS RESTAURANT (DBA CHICAGO PIZZA & BREWERY LP) (A CALIFORNIA

511 W 7Th St

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DASPIT, JOHN A

Defendant Attorney

WHITEHURST, DAVID WALTON

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

08/19/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

08/19/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Defendant Bj's Restaurant, Inc.'S First Original Answer

09/10/2021: Defendant Bj's Restaurant, Inc.'S First Original Answer

Citation

08/26/2021: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WHITEHURST, DAVID WALTON; Person Filing: BJS RESTAURANT (DBA CHICAGO PIZZA & BREWERY LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BJS RESTAURANT (DBA CHICAGO PIZZA & BREWERY LP) (A CALIFORNIA; Issued: 8/19/2021; Tracking: 73903708; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DASPIT, JOHN A; Person Filing: MCCLENDON, DEXTER;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BJS RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W Whitehurst