This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:18:46 (UTC).

MAY, MARGARITA vs. PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 MAY, MARGARITA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1388

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVAREZ, ODALIS

MAY, MARGARITA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED BY ITS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN C

KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

05/26/2020: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE

Affidavit of Service

05/29/2020: Affidavit of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED BY ITS; Issued: 5/26/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73752719; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: ALVAREZ, ODALIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: MAY, MARGARITA;

    Read MoreRead Less