This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:21:24 (UTC).

MAUSKAR, ANANT (M D) vs. JAIKARAN, JACQUES S

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 MAUSKAR, ANANT M D filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JAIKARAN, JACQUES S. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0682

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAUSKAR, ANANT (M D)

Defendant

JAIKARAN, JACQUES S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIRSCH, JAY DARWYN

Defendant Attorney

HARRISON, WILLIAM ERIC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2007
  • ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED ISSUING WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • ORDER GRANTING SANCTIONS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING DEPOSITION APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • ORDER GRANTING SANCTIONS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ACKNOWLEDGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2005
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2005
  • MOTION NEW TRIAL : Filing Attorney - HARRISON, WILLIAM ERIC Person Filing - JAIKARAN, JACQUES S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HIRSCH, JAY DARWYN Person Filing - MAUSKAR, ANANT (M D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2006
  • MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less