This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:47:37 (UTC).

MATOS, EOVER vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERRIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 MATOS, EOVER filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERRIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0111

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATOS, EOVER

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERRIFF'S DEPARTMENT

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC)

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Praire Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Praire Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Praire Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT SERVING DR TERESA MAY

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN, STACEY LEANESS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER SERVING MIKE GIORDANELLI; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950121; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950117; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950114; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT SERVING DR TERESA MAY; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950112; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950109; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950106; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950105; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950104; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950102; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73950101; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 12/13/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MORGAN, STACEY LEANESS; Person Filing: MATOS, EOVER;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant