This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/20/2021 at 07:44:19 (UTC).

MATOS, EFRAIN vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 MATOS, EFRAIN filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5411

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATOS, EFRAIN

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - CJAD

209 W 14Th St,

Austin, TX 78701

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES

1861 Old Spanish Trail,

Houston, TX 77030

PASADENA POLICE DEPARTMENT

1201 Davis St,

Pasadena, TX 77506

PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT

Po Box 1575,

Pasadena, TX 77501

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE PCT. 8 PLACE 1

7330 Spencer Hwy,

Pasadena, TX 77505

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PCT. 8

7330 Spencer Hwy,

Pasadena, TX 77505

WEBSTER POLICE DEPARTMENT

217 Pennsylvania Ave,

Webster, TX 77598

WEBSTER MUNICIPAL COURT

101 Pennsylvania Ave,

Webster, TX 77598

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

Po Box 4651

Houston, TX 77210

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

500 Jefferson Suite 600

Humble, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

5 More Parties Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WEBSTER MUNICIPAL COURT; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897978; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WEBSTER POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897977; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVED: PAPER SERVED NO SERVED DATE; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PCT. 8; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897976; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE PCT. 8 PLACE 1; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897972; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897971; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PASADENA POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897970; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897969; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - CJAD; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73897966; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73895000; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73894996; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73894994; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73894993; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73894992; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73894990; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73894989; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 8/4/2021; Tracking: 73894987; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/29/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: MATOS, EFRAIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less