Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/27/2021 at 08:01:29 (UTC).

MASON, JOSEPH vs. TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 MASON, JOSEPH filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6526

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASON, JOSEPH

Defendants

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK

PUBLICDATA.COM

7750 N. Mcarthur Blvd,

Irving, TX 75063

EQUIFAX

P.O. Box 740241,

Atlanta, GA 30374

EXPERIAN

P.O. Box 2104,

Allen, TX 75013

TRANS UNION

P.O. Box 1000,

Chester, PA 19022

NORTH AMERICAN INTERCONNECT, LLC

7975 N. Hayden Road,

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

LEXISNEXIS DOCUMENT SERVICES, INC

211 E. 7Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

NATIONAL CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRIAL SERVICES

JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

Others

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERLING, BRITTANY A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • HearingCourt: 165; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LEXISNEXIS DOCUMENT SERVICES, INC; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73873112; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NORTH AMERICAN INTERCONNECT, LLC; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73873110; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRANS UNION; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73873109; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EXPERIAN; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73873108; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EQUIFAX; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73873107; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PUBLICDATA.COM; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73873103; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) BY SERVING; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871950; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM (JIMS) BY SERVING; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871948; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871944; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NATIONAL CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871943; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871941; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871939; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871938; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871937; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871935; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 5/21/2021; Tracking: 73871933; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/19/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STERLING, BRITTANY A.; Person Filing: MASON, JOSEPH;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL CRIME INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) ATTN: EXPUNCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant