This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 08:15:40 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, KATALINA LYNN vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 MARTINEZ, KATALINA LYNN filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9947

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, KATALINA LYNN

Defendants

HUMBLE POLICE DEPARTMENT

310 Bender,

Humble, TX 77338

HARRIS COUNTY COURT AT LAW NO 6

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE

209 W 14Th Street Suite 400,

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Others

ALL CRIMINAL COURTS BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REINER, SCOTT DANIEL

1004 Prairie, S

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73768888; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HUMBLE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73768887; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766784; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALL CRIMINAL COURTS BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766782; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766781; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/15/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REINER, SCOTT DANIEL; Person Filing: MARTINEZ, KATALINA LYNN;

    Read MoreRead Less