This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 04:19:26 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, JEREMIAS R vs. CLEBURNE CAFETERIA INC (D/B/A CLEBURNE CAFETERIA)

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 MARTINEZ, JEREMIAS R filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CLEBURNE CAFETERIA INC D/B/A CLEBURNE CAFETERIA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS and CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3517

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, JEREMIAS R

Houston, TX 77089

Defendants

CLEBURNE CAFETERIA

CLEBURNE CAFETERIA INC (D/B/A CLEBURNE CAFETERIA)

Other

CLEBURNE CAFETERIA INC (D/B/A CLEBURNE CAFETERIA) (A DOMESTIC

3606 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARIF, SARFRAZ AFTAB

Defendant Attorney

WARSHAUER, JORDAN L

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Request for Disclosure

02/06/2017: Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Request for Disclosure

Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Interrogatories

02/06/2017: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Interrogatories

Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Production

02/06/2017: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Production

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

02/13/2017: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Notice of Oral Hearing

03/21/2017: Notice of Oral Hearing

Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel

03/21/2017: Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel

Defendant's Motion to Compel

03/21/2017: Defendant's Motion to Compel

Exhibit D - Email Correspondence

03/22/2017: Exhibit D - Email Correspondence

Exhibit C - Email Correspondence/Letter on Production

03/22/2017: Exhibit C - Email Correspondence/Letter on Production

Certificate of Written Discovery

03/23/2017: Certificate of Written Discovery

Reporter's Certificate Oral Deposition of Jeremias R Martinez May 11, 2017

06/06/2017: Reporter's Certificate Oral Deposition of Jeremias R Martinez May 11, 2017

Exhibit 09 - 2017-03-23 Plaintiff's Amended Response to Interrogatory v2

07/31/2017: Exhibit 09 - 2017-03-23 Plaintiff's Amended Response to Interrogatory v2

Exhibit 05 - 2017-07-27 Gutierrez Declaration

07/31/2017: Exhibit 05 - 2017-07-27 Gutierrez Declaration

Exhibit 02 - Martinez Deposition Transcript V3

07/31/2017: Exhibit 02 - Martinez Deposition Transcript V3

Defendant Cleburne Cafeteria's Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment

07/31/2017: Defendant Cleburne Cafeteria's Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Oral Hearing

08/02/2017: Notice of Oral Hearing

Civil Process Request Form

12/05/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

12/05/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Passed; Comments: FINAL SJ GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DEFAULT (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 239); Results: Passed; Requesting Party: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: SUMMARY JUDGMENT-PARTIAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A); Results: Granted; Requesting Party: WARSHAUER, JORDAN LYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketDescription: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/6/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketDescription: PLAINTIFF COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: COMPEL PRODUCTION (MOTION TO); Results: Passed; Requesting Party: WARSHAUER, JORDAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/13/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WARSHAUER, JORDAN L; Person Filing: CLEBURNE CAFETERIA INC (D/B/A CLEBURNE CAFETERIA);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WARSHAUER, JORDAN L; Person Filing: CLEBURNE CAFETERIA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CLEBURNE CAFETERIA INC (D/B/A CLEBURNE CAFETERIA) (A DOMESTIC; Issued: 12/5/2016; Tracking: 73317710; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHARIF, SARFRAZ AFTAB; Person Filing: MARTINEZ, JEREMIAS R;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharif, Sarfraz Aftab