This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:05:59 (UTC).

MARSH, BRENNON LEE vs. KRISHER-MARSH, ROXIE ANN

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 MARSH, BRENNON LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KRISHER-MARSH, ROXIE ANN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8034

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSH, BRENNON LEE

Defendant

KRISHER-MARSH, ROXIE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARSH, RONALD L.

MARSH, RONALD LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MARSH, RONALD LEE Person Filing - MARSH, BRENNON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less