This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 04:22:58 (UTC).

MANUEL INDUSTRIAL UPHOLSTERY LLC vs. VALU INDUSTRIAL/ER SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 MANUEL INDUSTRIAL UPHOLSTERY LLC filed an Other lawsuit against VALU INDUSTRIAL/ER SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0224

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANUEL INDUSTRIAL UPHOLSTERY LLC

Defendant

VALU INDUSTRIAL/ER SERVICES LLC

Other

VALU INDUSTRIAL/ER SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

6914 East Freeway

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENDERSON, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

07/07/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Civil Case Information Sheet

07/07/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Manuel Industrial Upholstery LLC's Original Verified Petition Against Valu Industrial/ER Services LLC and Request for Disclosures

07/07/2020: Manuel Industrial Upholstery LLC's Original Verified Petition Against Valu Industrial/ER Services LLC and Request for Disclosures

Manuel Industrial Upholstery LLC's First Amended Verified Petition Against Valu Industrual/ER Services LLC and Request for Disclosures

07/09/2020: Manuel Industrial Upholstery LLC's First Amended Verified Petition Against Valu Industrual/ER Services LLC and Request for Disclosures

Return of Service

07/10/2020: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HENDERSON, TIMOTHY JAMES; Person Filing: MANUEL INDUSTRIAL UPHOLSTERY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VALU INDUSTRIAL/ER SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 7/8/2020; Tracking: 73764828; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HENDERSON, TIMOTHY JAMES; Person Filing: MANUEL INDUSTRIAL UPHOLSTERY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less