This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/18/2018 at 18:54:56 (UTC).

MANNO, PAUL vs. ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 MANNO, PAUL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLINE BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0505

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CAROLINE BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANNO, PAUL

Houston, TX 77041

Defendant

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C T Corporation System

Dallas, TX 75201

Other

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED

1999 Byran Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILSON, CHAD T

WILSON, CHAD TROY

Defendant Attorney

FEARS, CHRISTINA MARSHON

 

Court Documents

Filing letter

02/18/2016: Filing letter

Civil Case Information Sheet

02/18/2016: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition, jury demand, and request for disclosure

02/18/2016: Plaintiffs Original Petition, jury demand, and request for disclosure

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6309 0097

02/22/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6309 0097

Certified Mail Receipt

02/26/2016: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

03/03/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

03/03/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

03/03/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

03/03/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

03/03/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

03/03/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Allstate's Vehicle and Property Insurance Company's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/17/2016: Allstate's Vehicle and Property Insurance Company's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

COURT SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED

04/07/2016: COURT SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED

Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses

09/12/2016: Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses

Proposed Order

11/22/2016: Proposed Order

Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice

11/22/2016: Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice

DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

11/28/2016: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2016
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Description: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 11/28/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Description: COURT SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/7/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATE EXPEDITED TRIAL READY GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Description: MOTION TO REMOVE TRIAL READY STATUS GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FEARS, CHRISTINA MARSHON; Person Filing: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILSON, CHAD TROY; Person Filing: MANNO, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less