This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/01/2021 at 07:36:12 (UTC).

MANAURE, MARIELENA vs. DE LA CRUZ, EMMAUEL (MD)

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 MANAURE, MARIELENA filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DE LA CRUZ, EMMAUEL MD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4062

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANAURE, MARIELENA

Defendants

DE LA CRUZ, EMMAUEL (MD)

Woodlands, TX 77380

CYPRESS SURGICENTER LLC

Other

CYPRESS SURGICENTER LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

2219 Sawdust Rd The

Woodlands, TX 77380

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

Defendant Attorney

MAYES, JEFFREY SHANNON

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

06/07/2021: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Request for Issuance of Service

06/07/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

06/07/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit C

06/07/2021: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

06/07/2021: Exhibit B

Envelope

06/09/2021: Envelope

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

06/09/2021: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

Citation

06/14/2021: Citation

Temporary Restraining Order - Service Return

06/14/2021: Temporary Restraining Order - Service Return

Proposed Agreed Temporary Injunction

06/16/2021: Proposed Agreed Temporary Injunction

Citation

06/16/2021: Citation

Exhibit B

06/17/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

06/17/2021: Exhibit A

Notice of Hearing

06/21/2021: Notice of Hearing

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

06/21/2021: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Dissolve Agreed Temporary Injunction

06/25/2021: Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Dissolve Agreed Temporary Injunction

Exhibit D

06/28/2021: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

06/28/2021: Exhibit C

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingCourt: 055; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingCourt: 055; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • HearingCourt: 055; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: DISMISS (MOTION TO); Requesting Party: MAYES, JEFFREY SHANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • HearingCourt: 055; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Results: Passed; Comments: AGREED ORDER FILED 6/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY; Order Signed: 6/16/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Order Signed: 6/16/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Person: DE LA CRUZ, EMMAUEL (MD); Issued: 6/9/2021; Served: 6/15/2021; Tracking: 73878874; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Person: CYPRESS SURGICENTER LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 6/9/2021; Served: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73878871; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingCourt: 190; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Results: Granted; Comments: O/S 06/07/21; Requesting Party: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DE LA CRUZ, EMMAUEL (MD); Issued: 6/9/2021; Served: 6/15/2021; Tracking: 73878634; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CYPRESS SURGICENTER LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 6/9/2021; Served: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73878497; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/7/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 6/7/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/7/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.; Person Filing: MANAURE, MARIELENA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less