This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:03:40 (UTC).

MAGEE, SUSAN vs. MAGEE, DAVID E

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 MAGEE, SUSAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MAGEE, DAVID E. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8010

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MAGEE, SUSAN

MAGEE, DAVID E

MAGEE, SUSAN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GLOVER, SHARI LYNN

LEWIS, ROBERT L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2007
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • OTHER DISPOSITION ON COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • ANSWER TO MOTION ENFORCEMENT : Filing Attorney - ZIMMERMAN, MARCIA L. Person Filing - MAGEE, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2006
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2006
  • MOTION TO ENFORCE (FAMILY) : Filing Attorney - LEWIS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - MAGEE, DAVID E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - LEWIS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - MAGEE, DAVID E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GLOVER, SHARI LYNN Person Filing - MAGEE, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GLOVER, SHARI LYNN Person Filing - MAGEE, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2005
  • TEMPORARY ORD SIGNED WITHOUT CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - LEWIS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - MAGEE, DAVID E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEWIS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - MAGEE, DAVID E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GLOVER, SHARI LYNN Person Filing - MAGEE, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less