This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/31/2023 at 06:25:50 (UTC).

M-I L L C (D/B/A MI-SWACO) vs. PERFORMANCE DRILLING COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 M-I L L C D/B/A MI-SWACO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERFORMANCE DRILLING COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8739

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M-I L L C (D/B/A MI-SWACO)

MI-SWACO

Defendant

PERFORMANCE DRILLING COMPANY LLC

Other

PERFORMANCE DRILLING COMPANY LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMM, HOLLY CYNTHIA MATCHU

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's original petition and request for disclosure

06/29/2020: Plaintiff's original petition and request for disclosure

Civil case information sheet

06/29/2020: Civil case information sheet

Exhibit 01

06/29/2020: Exhibit 01

Request for Issuance of Service

06/29/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Affidavit of Service

07/07/2020: Affidavit of Service

Proposed Final Judgment

08/25/2020: Proposed Final Judgment

Notice of Submission

08/25/2020: Notice of Submission

Exhibit E

08/25/2020: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

08/25/2020: Exhibit D

Exhibit C-01

08/25/2020: Exhibit C-01

Exhibit C

08/25/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

08/25/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

08/25/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment

08/25/2020: Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

09/21/2020: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES; Order Signed: 9/21/2020;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/21/2020;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • HearingCourt: 295; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DEFAULT (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 239); Results: Granted; Comments: OS 9/21; Requesting Party: HAMM, HOLLY CYNTHIA MATCHU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PERFORMANCE DRILLING COMPANY LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 7/2/2020; Served: 7/6/2020; Tracking: 73763729; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAMM, HOLLY CYNTHIA MATCHU; Person Filing: M-I L L C (D/B/A MI-SWACO);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAMM, HOLLY CYNTHIA MATCHU; Person Filing: MI-SWACO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less