This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/21/2019 at 07:29:17 (UTC).

LUBRIZOL CORPORATION vs. CAMP, JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 LUBRIZOL CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CAMP, JAMES. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6536

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUBRIZOL CORPORATION

41 Tidal Road

Deer Park, TX 77536

Defendants

APPLIED AQUATICS LABS

Pasadena, TX 77504

BAY AREA ANALYTICAL LABORATORY

Pasadena, TX 77504

CAMP, JAMES

New Braunfels, TX 78132

Others

APPLIED AQUATICS LABS (AN UNINCORPORATED TEXAS BUSINESS)

New Braunfels, TX

BAY AREA ANALYTICAL LABORATORY MAY BE SERVED BY

New Braunfels, TX 78132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIZELL, PATRICK W.

1001 Fannin St

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

01/28/2019: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing

01/28/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing

Exhibit A

01/28/2019: Exhibit A

Affidavit

01/28/2019: Affidavit

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

01/28/2019: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

01/29/2019: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Plaintiff's Request an Expedited Ex Parte Hearing on Request for Writ of Attachment

01/29/2019: Plaintiff's Request an Expedited Ex Parte Hearing on Request for Writ of Attachment

Applied Aquatics Request for Service

01/29/2019: Applied Aquatics Request for Service

James A Camp Request for Service

01/29/2019: James A Camp Request for Service

Bay Area Analytical Laboratory Request

01/29/2019: Bay Area Analytical Laboratory Request

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

01/29/2019: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

Notice of Hearing

01/30/2019: Notice of Hearing

Order Granting Application For Writ of Attachment

02/04/2019: Order Granting Application For Writ of Attachment

Notice of Filing Amended Proposed Writ of Attachment

02/04/2019: Notice of Filing Amended Proposed Writ of Attachment

BOND WAIVED/NO BOND SET

02/11/2019: BOND WAIVED/NO BOND SET

Agreed Temporary Injunction

02/11/2019: Agreed Temporary Injunction

Notice of Filing Agreed Temporary Injunction

02/11/2019: Notice of Filing Agreed Temporary Injunction

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

02/13/2019: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Order Signed: 2/11/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY; Order Signed: 2/11/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Description: BOND WAIVED/NO BOND SET; Order Signed: 2/11/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED ISSUING WRIT OF ATTACHMENT; Order Signed: 2/7/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 1/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MIZELL, PATRICK W.; Person Filing: LUBRIZOL CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Description: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 2/7/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less