This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:10:34 (UTC).

LOZANO, MARIO vs. CENTERPOINT RESOURCE CORP (DBA CENTERPOI

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 LOZANO, MARIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CENTERPOINT RESOURCE CORP DBA CENTERPOI. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8397

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOZANO, MARIO

Defendants

CENTERPOINT RESOURCE CORP (DBA CENTERPOINT ENERGY ENTEX)

CENTERPOINT ENERGY ENTEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALTENBERN, DAVID T.

Defendant Attorney

HOWARD, STEVEN C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • SETTLEMENT THROUGH MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • ORDER DENYING SANCTIONS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOWARD, STEVEN C. Person Filing - CENTERPOINT ENERGY ENTEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOWARD, STEVEN C. Person Filing - CENTERPOINT RESOURCE CORP (DBA CENTERPOINT ENERGY ENTEX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALTENBERN, DAVID T. Person Filing - LOZANO, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less