Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/06/2019 at 07:31:43 (UTC).

LOUANNA VALLEY (AS PERSONALLY REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES vs. AMETEK INC

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 LOUANNA VALLEY AS PERSONALLY REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES filed an Other lawsuit against AMETEK INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8658

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Defendants

FLUOR MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC

ANCO INSULATION INC

PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC

FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTION INC

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC

FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

NOOTER CORPORATION

NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES INC

CBS CORPORATION (AS SUCCESSOR TO WESTINGHOUSE)

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

REF-CHEM L P

ZURN INDUSTRIES LLC

A W CHESTERTON CO

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

TRECO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE CO

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

WHITE, CLAY M.

BEAN, MELANIE ANNE

Other Attorneys

PARKS, KEVIN JAMES

WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE

MOORE, COLIN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Exhibit B

12/13/2018: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

12/13/2018: Exhibit A

Cover Letter

12/13/2018: Cover Letter

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case and Subject to Motion to Transfer Venue

12/13/2018: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case and Subject to Motion to Transfer Venue

Certificate Of Filing Written Discovery

12/28/2018: Certificate Of Filing Written Discovery

General Electric Company's Notice Of Adoption Of Discovery Responses And Designation Of Fact And Expert Witnesses Filed a"In Re Asbestos Litigation"

12/28/2018: General Electric Company's Notice Of Adoption Of Discovery Responses And Designation Of Fact And Expert Witnesses Filed a"In Re Asbestos Litigation"

Filing Letter(Certificate of Written Discovery, Designation of Fact and Expert Witness)

12/28/2018: Filing Letter(Certificate of Written Discovery, Designation of Fact and Expert Witness)

Certificate of Filing Written Discovery

12/28/2018: Certificate of Filing Written Discovery

Defendant's Notice of Adoption and Reliance on Discovery Responses, Responses to Request for Disclosure and Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses Filed in "IN RE Asbestos Litigation

12/28/2018: Defendant's Notice of Adoption and Reliance on Discovery Responses, Responses to Request for Disclosure and Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses Filed in "IN RE Asbestos Litigation

Filing Letter(Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition , Answer to Cross-Actions and Request for Bifurcated Trial)

12/28/2018: Filing Letter(Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition , Answer to Cross-Actions and Request for Bifurcated Trial)

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition , Answer to Cross-Actions and Request for Bifurcated Trial

12/28/2018: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition , Answer to Cross-Actions and Request for Bifurcated Trial

Filing Letter(Defendant General Electric Company's Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer,and Answer to All Cross Actions)

12/28/2018: Filing Letter(Defendant General Electric Company's Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer,and Answer to All Cross Actions)

Defendant General Electric Company's Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer,and Answer to All Cross Actions

12/28/2018: Defendant General Electric Company's Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer,and Answer to All Cross Actions

Defendant Ametek, INC.'S Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

01/02/2019: Defendant Ametek, INC.'S Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition Subject to its Motion to Transfer Venue

Filing Letter(Defendant, Cleaver-Brooks, INC., F/K/A Aqua-Chem, INC., D/B/A Cleaver-Brooks, Division, Original Answer and Answer To Cross-Actions

01/02/2019: Filing Letter(Defendant, Cleaver-Brooks, INC., F/K/A Aqua-Chem, INC., D/B/A Cleaver-Brooks, Division, Original Answer and Answer To Cross-Actions

Defendant, Cleaver-Brooks, INC., F/K/A Aqua-Chem, INC., D/B/A Cleaver-Brooks, Division, Original Answer and Answer To Cross-Actions

01/02/2019: Defendant, Cleaver-Brooks, INC., F/K/A Aqua-Chem, INC., D/B/A Cleaver-Brooks, Division, Original Answer and Answer To Cross-Actions

Nooter Corporation Original Answer

01/03/2019: Nooter Corporation Original Answer

Defendant Honeywell International INC.'S Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer

01/04/2019: Defendant Honeywell International INC.'S Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARKS, KEVIN JAMES; Person Filing: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER; Filing Attorney: BEAN, MELANIE ANNE; Person Filing: NOOTER CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WHITE, CLAY M.; Person Filing: CLEAVER-BROOKS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE; Person Filing: AMETEK INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM; Person Filing: DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM; Person Filing: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM; Person Filing: CBS CORPORATION (AS SUCCESSOR TO WESTINGHOUSE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM; Person Filing: PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: LOUANNA VALLEY (AS PERSONALLY REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pennsylvania Office of Consumer Advocate is a litigant

Latest cases where INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEAVER BROOKS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where NOOTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC is a litigant