This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/13/2021 at 19:25:03 (UTC).

LOPEZ, SUSAN (INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTAT vs. SMITH, CLINT AARON

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 LOPEZ, SUSAN INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTAT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SMITH, CLINT AARON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2664

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ, SUSAN (INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE

VEGA, JOE JR

ESTATE OF HOLLY VEGA

Defendants

JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC

JACOBS FIELD SERVICES NORTH AMERICA,INC(IMPROPERLY SUED AS JACOBS

Others

TRI CITY FUNDING AND MANAGEMENT LLC (D/B/A THE REPUBLIC HOUSE) (IS A

JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC (IS A CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

Guardian Ad Litem

CARTER, ERIC WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILDE, BRADFORD JOE

Defendant Attorney

KERLIN, PAUL BROWN

 

Court Documents

Filing Letter to Clerk

10/20/2015: Filing Letter to Clerk

Case Information Sheet

10/20/2015: Case Information Sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

10/20/2015: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

10/26/2015: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Defendant Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.'s Improperly Sued as Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. Original answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

11/25/2015: Defendant Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.'s Improperly Sued as Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. Original answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Request for Jury Trial

12/23/2015: Request for Jury Trial

Defendant's Original Answer

12/23/2015: Defendant's Original Answer

Defendant's Original Answer

12/23/2015: Defendant's Original Answer

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

02/22/2016: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Proposed Order

03/29/2016: Proposed Order

Proposed Order

03/29/2016: Proposed Order

Notice of Hearing

03/29/2016: Notice of Hearing

Exhibit 7

03/29/2016: Exhibit 7

Exhibit 6

03/29/2016: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 5

03/29/2016: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 4

03/29/2016: Exhibit 4

Exhibit 3

03/29/2016: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

03/29/2016: Exhibit 2

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 4/10/2018;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR MINOR SETTLEMENT GRANTED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORD SGND GRNTG THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SETTLEMENT FUND; Order Signed: 4/10/2018;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT ON MINORS SETTLEMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/10/2018;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: STATUS CONFERENCE; Results: Passed; Comments: PER AD LITEM/ M MORENO 10:30A 3/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Re-Set; Comments: PER THE COURT - ORAL HEARING NEEDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDescription: FEE AWARDED TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Order Signed: 11/30/2017;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COOPER, MICHAEL W.; Person Filing: TRI CITY FUNDING AND MANAGEMENT LLC (D/B/A THE REPUBLIC HOUSE);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KERLIN, PAUL BROWN; Person Filing: JACOBS FIELD SERVICES NORTH AMERICA,INC(IMPROPERLY SUED AS JACOBS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 10/26/2015; Tracking: 73182259; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRI CITY FUNDING AND MANAGEMENT LLC (D/B/A THE REPUBLIC HOUSE) (IS A; Issued: 10/26/2015; Tracking: 73182258; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC (IS A CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 10/26/2015; Tracking: 73182254; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILDE, BRADFORD JOE; Person Filing: ESTATE OF HOLLY VEGA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILDE, BRADFORD JOE; Person Filing: VEGA, JOE JR;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILDE, BRADFORD JOE; Person Filing: LOPEZ, SUSAN (INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less