This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/06/2020 at 08:21:45 (UTC).

LOPEZ, SUSAN (INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL R vs. PLATAS, JUAN RAMIRO

Case Summary

On 02/24/2015 LOPEZ, SUSAN INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL R filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PLATAS, JUAN RAMIRO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0857

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ, SUSAN (INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF

VEGA, JOE JR (MINOR)

Defendants

PLATAS, JUAN RAMIRO

SMITH, CLINT AARON

JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC

"THE REPUBLIC HOUSE"

TRI CITY FUNDING AND MANAGEMENT LLC (DBA "THE REPUBLIC HOUSE")

Others

JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC (A CORPORATION) BY SERVING THROUGH ITS

TRI CITY FUNDING AND MANAGEMENT LLC (DBA "THE REPUBLIC HOUSE") (A

Guardian Ad Litem

KRETZER, SETH H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILDE, BRADFORD JOE

Defendant Attorneys

COOPER, MICHAEL W

KERLIN, PAUL BROWN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Information Sheet

02/24/2015: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition & Requests for Disclosure

02/24/2015: Plaintiffs Original Petition & Requests for Disclosure

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

02/25/2015: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Proposed Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

04/10/2015: Proposed Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Agreed Motion for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

04/10/2015: Agreed Motion for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED

04/17/2015: ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED

Confirmation Information

04/21/2015: Confirmation Information

Notice of Settlement Conference

04/23/2015: Notice of Settlement Conference

FEE AWARDED TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM

05/18/2015: FEE AWARDED TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Plaintiffs 1st Amended Petition and Requests for Disclosure

06/18/2015: Plaintiffs 1st Amended Petition and Requests for Disclosure

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

06/19/2015: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Plaintiffs second Amended Petition and Request For Disclosure

06/26/2015: Plaintiffs second Amended Petition and Request For Disclosure

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

07/01/2015: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

07/01/2015: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

07/30/2015: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

Proposed Final Judgment

08/10/2015: Proposed Final Judgment

EACH PAY OWN

08/11/2015: EACH PAY OWN

Affidavit of Service

08/18/2015: Affidavit of Service

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2015
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MOTION TO ENTER NUNC PRO TUNC; Results: Denied; Comments: O/S 10-19-15; Requesting Party: HOMAN, NICHOLAS ALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DENYING ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/19/2015;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COOPER, MICHAEL W; Person Filing: TRI CITY FUNDING AND MANAGEMENT LLC (DBA "THE REPUBLIC HOUSE");

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COOPER, MICHAEL W; Person Filing: SMITH, CLINT AARON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KERLIN, PAUL BROWN; Person Filing: JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED ESTABLISHING TRUST FUND ACCOUNT; Order Signed: 8/11/2015;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT ON MINORS SETTLEMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 8/11/2015;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SMITH, CLINT AARON; Issued: 6/19/2015; Tracking: 73142128; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILDE, BRADFORD JOE; Person Filing: LOPEZ, SUSAN (INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILDE, BRADFORD JOE; Person Filing: VEGA, JOE JR (MINOR);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MINOR SETTLEMENT (STATUTORY); Results: Granted; Comments: SEE O/S 8-11-15; Requesting Party: KRETZER, SETH H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketDescription: FEE AWARDED TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Order Signed: 5/18/2015;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR MINOR SETTLEMENT GRANTED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 4/17/2015;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PLATAS, JUAN RAMIRO; Issued: 2/25/2015; Tracking: 73106766; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILDE, BRADFORD JOE; Person Filing: LOPEZ, SUSAN (INDIVIDUALLY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GILDE, BRADFORD JOE; Person Filing: VEGA, JOE JR (MINOR);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less