This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/24/2018 at 16:44:07 (UTC).

LOPEZ, EMILIO vs. CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 03/10/2016 LOPEZ, EMILIO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRENT GAMBLE. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5836

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRENT GAMBLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ, EMILIO

Houston, TX 77027

Defendants

TEXAS ONCOLOGY P A

CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

TEXAS ONCOLOGY P A (DBA TEXAS UROLOGY SPECIALISTS)

TEXAS UROLOGY SPECIALISTS

RODRIGUEZ, GABRIEL (MD)

Webster, TX 77598

CHCA CLEAR LAKE L P (DBA CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER)

TEXAS UROLOGY SPECIALISTS- WEBSTER

Others

CHCA CLEAR LAKE L P (DBA CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER) BY

TEXAS ONCOLOGY P A BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT JOHN SIMS

CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

TEXAS ONCOLOGY P A (DBA TEXAS UROLOGY SPECIALITSTS) BY SERVING ITS

TEXAS UROLOGY SPECIALISTS-WEBSTER BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESTEMAKER, DAVID KENT

3100 Timmons Su

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorneys

HOUSTON, SAMUEL A.

2777 Allen Park

Houston, TX 77019

ANDREWS, NICOLE G.

2929 Allen Park

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

Original answer of defendants Gabriel Rodriguez, M.D, Texas oncology, P.A. d/b/a texas urology specialists, Texas oncology, P.A. and texas urology specialists, request for disclosures and jury demand

04/13/2016: Original answer of defendants Gabriel Rodriguez, M.D, Texas oncology, P.A. d/b/a texas urology specialists, Texas oncology, P.A. and texas urology specialists, request for disclosures and jury demand

Affidavit of Approved Process Server

04/20/2016: Affidavit of Approved Process Server

Certified Mail Receipt

04/20/2016: Certified Mail Receipt

Affidavit of Approved Process Server

04/20/2016: Affidavit of Approved Process Server

Citation

04/20/2016: Citation

Citation

04/20/2016: Citation

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

08/31/2016: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Proposed Order

01/30/2017: Proposed Order

Certification Pursuant to Rule 203(.1)(.2) &(.3)

04/14/2017: Certification Pursuant to Rule 203(.1)(.2) &(.3)

Certification Pursuant to Rule 203(.1)(.2) &(.3)

04/14/2017: Certification Pursuant to Rule 203(.1)(.2) &(.3)

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

04/18/2017: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Proposed Order

12/08/2017: Proposed Order

Exhibit A

01/25/2018: Exhibit A

Defendant Gabriel Rodriguez, M.D.'s Traditional and No-Evidence Motions for Summary Judgment

01/25/2018: Defendant Gabriel Rodriguez, M.D.'s Traditional and No-Evidence Motions for Summary Judgment

Exhibit B

02/16/2018: Exhibit B

Third Agreed Motion for Continuance

03/05/2018: Third Agreed Motion for Continuance

Defendant Gabriel Rodriguez, M.D.'s Notice of Intent to Use Documents Pursuant to Rule 193.7

07/06/2018: Defendant Gabriel Rodriguez, M.D.'s Notice of Intent to Use Documents Pursuant to Rule 193.7

PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

07/09/2018: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 8/28/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Description: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 7/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Description: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDREWS, NICOLE G.; Person Filing: CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Description: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDREWS, NICOLE G.; Person Filing: CHCA CLEAR LAKE L P (DBA CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Description: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDREWS, NICOLE G.; Person Filing: CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MESTEMAKER, DAVID KENT; Person Filing: LOPEZ, EMILIO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 3/20/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 3/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDREWS, NICOLE G.; Person Filing: CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDREWS, NICOLE G.; Person Filing: CHCA CLEAR LAKE L P (DBA CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSTON, SAMUEL A.; Person Filing: TEXAS ONCOLOGY P A (DBA TEXAS UROLOGY SPECIALISTS);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSTON, SAMUEL A.; Person Filing: RODRIGUEZ, GABRIEL (MD);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSTON, SAMUEL A.; Person Filing: TEXAS UROLOGY SPECIALISTS- WEBSTER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSTON, SAMUEL A.; Person Filing: TEXAS ONCOLOGY P A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MESTEMAKER, DAVID KENT; Person Filing: LOPEZ, EMILIO;

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.